VINCENT'S APPEAL TRUST COMPANY

Charity number: 1117802
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ian Ritchie Chair 01 January 2019 None on record
Dr Ronan Llyr Trustee 24 September 2018 None on record
Andrew Hobart Trustee 27 January 2017 None on record
Thomas Oliver Russell Perry Trustee 11 April 2016 None on record
CHRISTOPHER JENKINS Trustee 29 October 2012 None on record
Giles Spackman Trustee 25 September 2017
THE COLLEGE OF SAINT MARY OF WINCHESTER IN OXFORD, COMMONLY CALLED NEW COLLEGE Received: On time
Dr Adam Healy Trustee 09 April 2013 None on record
Dr HEATHER LAWRENCE Trustee 21 November 2016 None on record
JAMES FINCH Trustee 11 April 2016 None on record
Dr JONATHAN PEARSON-STUTTARD Trustee 19 March 2015 None on record
John Webster Trustee 17 March 2015
GREEN TEMPLETON COLLEGE Received: On time
THE TEMPLETON EDUCATION AND CHARITY TRUST Received: On time
Dr RICHARD GARETH WOODFINE Trustee 01 October 2010 None on record
Vicky Griffiths Trustee 24 September 2018 None on record
Philip Weaver Trustee 02 February 2015 None on record