COVENANTED CHRIST UNIVERSAL CHURCH OF GOD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education/Training, Relief of Poverty, Religious activities Children/Young people, Elderly/Old People
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 03 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 March 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BIMBOLA PATRICIA EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SYLVESTER OLADELE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AYOKOLE JOSEPH AKINSETE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 03/06/2020 | 03/06/2021 | 03/06/2022 | 03/06/2023 | 03/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.10k | £129 | £565 | £2.01k | £1.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.75k | £1.20k | £925 | £2.45k | £2.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 June 2024 | 10 May 2025 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 June 2023 | 27 August 2024 | 146 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 June 2022 | 10 May 2023 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 June 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 June 2020 | 16 March 2022 | 347 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 3 JANUARY 2007.
Charitable objects
3.2 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: 3.2.1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; 3.2.2 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AN FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; AND 3.2.3 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT. 3.3 THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE CHURCH IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
IN PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGOM OR THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 HUDSON PLACE
LONDON
SE18 7SL
- Phone:
- 02084888318
- Email:
- pastor@ccucg.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window