Financial history SOMEBODY'S DAUGHTER MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 1117870
Charity reporting is overdue by 1242 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.02k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £1.84k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A