Hear Me Out Music

Charity number: 1119049
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SUE LUKES Chair 02 May 2007
KEHILLAH NORTH LONDON Received: On time
Alastair Owen Trustee 23 August 2019 None on record
Bridget Rennie Trustee 30 January 2018 None on record
Vebi Kosumi LLB LLM Trustee 02 May 2007
KENT COAST VOLUNTEERING LTD Received: On time
PETER FRANKENTAL Trustee 02 May 2007
LONDON MINING NETWORK Received: On time
Hannah Wilkinson Trustee 05 July 2019 None on record
CLARE SCOTT BOOTH Trustee 01 February 2019
EALING JUNIOR MUSIC SCHOOL Received: On time
Lamin Joof Trustee 23 August 2019 None on record
Dr Kai Syng Tan Trustee 23 August 2019 None on record
MARIE-ANNE MACKIE Trustee 31 July 2014 None on record
JOANNA RIDOUT Trustee 28 January 2010 None on record