Trustees CHALFONTS BEEKEEPERS SOCIETY

Charity number: 1121231
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gillian Erica Jones Chair 24 November 2020
None on record
Julie Louise Hayes Trustee 23 November 2021
None on record
Giles Edward Kenwright Trustee 13 April 2021
None on record
Stephen John Troll Trustee 24 November 2020
None on record
Dorothie Ann Jones Trustee 01 February 2020
None on record
James Liness Trustee 27 November 2018
None on record
Jonathan Lee Trustee 26 November 2018
None on record
Edward Townsend Trustee 22 November 2016
None on record
Mr Mike Walters Trustee 24 November 2015
None on record
Helen Cave Trustee 26 November 2013
BUCKS COUNTY BEEKEEPERS ASSOCIATION
Received: On time