Accounts and annual returns SOROPTIMIST INTERNATIONAL OF WALES SOUTH HEALTH EDUCATION & HYGIENE TRUST

Charity number: 1119339
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 November 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required