THE TWO ST JAMES TRUST

Charity number: 1117902
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 29 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required