THE TWO ST JAMES TRUST

Charity number: 1117902
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.97k £3.00k £3.02k £3.04k £3.05k
Total expenditure £8.59k £8.64k £8.76k £8.29k £6.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A