MALVERN CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 1117906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £19.60k £20.23k £22.54k £16.37k £34.10k
Total expenditure £21.65k £20.07k £20.17k £20.61k £13.95k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £200 £1.20k N/A £1.90k