Financial history AFRICA RESEARCH INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1118470
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £57 £60.27k £61.21k £180.00k £51.03k
Total expenditure £4.48k £84.99k £95.21k £94.08k £87.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A