THE SURREY CRICKET BOARD

Charity number: 1118770
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SIMON DYSON Chair 20 November 2013 None on record
SOPHIE KENT Trustee 20 November 2017
LONDON CRICKET TRUST Received: On time
DAVID KINGSMILL Trustee 21 March 2011 None on record
Crispin Lyden-Cowan Trustee 18 November 2019 None on record
Emma Lewendon Trustee 28 January 2019 None on record
Ann Cottis Trustee 24 November 2014
THE ARTS EDUCATIONAL SCHOOLS Received: On time
RICHARD LAUDY Trustee 01 May 2012 None on record
Nigel Martyn Trustee 18 November 2019 None on record
Barbar Qureshi Trustee 27 March 2013 None on record
David Gill Trustee 20 November 2013 None on record
STEVE MACDONALD Trustee None on record