PIONEER TRUST

Charity number: 1118766
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 08 July 2020 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

08 July 2020 8 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 12 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 15 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 15 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 27 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 27 June 2017 On time Download