PIONEER TRUST

Charity number: 1118766
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £257.06k £212.63k £236.25k £202.55k £258.57k
Total expenditure £210.24k £191.28k £247.06k £221.77k £225.38k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A