PIONEER TRUST

Charity number: 1118766
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Vanessa Wilson Trustee 01 September 2019
LICC LIMITED Received: On time
Richard White Trustee 09 July 2020
THE BRIDGE (EAST MIDLANDS) Received: On time
ONE IN A MILLION (SPORTS) Received: On time
Joanna Rachel Musgrove Trustee 30 September 2015 None on record
Stephen Mark Clifford Chair 13 April 2021 None on record
MR Billy Kennedy Trustee 01 October 2016
NEW COMMUNITY NETWORK Received: On time