Accounts and annual returns LONDON SIKH CENTRE (EALING)

Charity number: 1118356
Charity reporting is overdue by 416 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 51 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 51 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 416 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 416 days Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 March 2021 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 March 2021 57 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 01 June 2020 122 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 01 June 2020 122 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 08 April 2019 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 08 April 2019 67 days late Download Open in new window