THE DOROTHY GORDON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1117928
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
20/12/2015 20/12/2016 20/12/2017 20/12/2018 20/12/2019
Total gross income £6.77k £7.16k £7.73k £7.88k £7.05k
Total expenditure £6.75k £7.19k £7.84k £7.66k £7.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A