Financial history MEDICAL EDUCATIONAL AND FINANCIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1118756
Charity reporting is overdue by 159 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £100 £3.94k £1.52k £50 £0
Total expenditure £562 £0 £525 £5.41k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A