WELWYN HATFIELD ISLAMIC SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1123169
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promotion of religion of Islam and organising and running charitable events within the local community Welwyn Garden City and Hatfiled. Islamic Education for the young within the local community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2013

Total income: £31,458
Total expenditure: £10,769

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 March 2008: Standard registration
  • 26 February 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
  • 26 February 2015: Funds transferred to 1155040 WELWYN ISLAMIC SOCIETY
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013
Total gross income £12.69k £19.52k £21.23k £29.74k £31.46k
Total expenditure £4.65k £11.01k £11.21k £11.82k £10.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2013 05 September 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 06 January 2015 67 days late
Annual return 31 December 2012 16 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 16 October 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2011 02 March 2013 122 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required