THE BASCOMBE FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1118073
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 23 November 2020 09 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 23 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 23 November 2019 16 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 23 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 23 November 2018 06 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 23 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 23 November 2017 27 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 23 November 2017 Not Required
Annual return 23 November 2016 24 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 23 November 2016 Not Required