THE BASCOMBE FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1118073
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 23/11/2016 23/11/2017 23/11/2018 23/11/2019 23/11/2020
Total gross income £3.94k £5.85k £6.42k £6.60k £8.40k
Total expenditure £3.23k £4.57k £7.23k £6.87k £8.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A