YNYSYBWL REGENERATION PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
YRP are now able to offer the base to a wider range of clients due to the base being fully compliant with the Disability Act. Current organisations and groups using our facilities are DWP, Ynysybwl & Coed y Cwm Community Council, Daerwynno and CRI. The base is used as a 'One Stop Shop' information point where local groups and businesses promote their organisations, activities and events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income includes £17,857 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
26 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
Governance
- 30 September 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clifford Chay Binks Mr | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Musgrave | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Hicks | Trustee | 14 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Clive William Thomas | Trustee | 11 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Castle OBE | Trustee | 24 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
STEVE CURRY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Arfon Williams | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £336.73k | £353.38k | £535.91k | £254.96k | £161.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £233.45k | £264.45k | £393.19k | £283.83k | £223.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £77.93k | £81.49k | £75.64k | N/A | £17.86k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £5.78k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £5.05k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £525.09k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £390.89k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £1.50k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £2.30k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 26 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 27 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 JULY 2007 AS AMENDED 18 SEPTEMBER 2008 as amended on 12 Feb 2019 as amended on 12 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
3.1 THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE ELECTORAL WARD OF YNYSYBWL AND COED-Y-CWM) BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 3.1.1 THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT; 3.1.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; 3.1.3 THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING AND LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING; 3.1.4 THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES; 3.1.5 THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE; 3.1.6 THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES. 3.1.7 THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT; 3.1.8 THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME; 3.1.9 SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES. 3.2 TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE DISADVANTAGED ELECTORAL WARD OF YNYSYBWL AND COED-Y-CWM, RHONDDA CYNON TAFF, IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Windsor Place
Ynysybwl
Pontypridd
RCT
CF37 3HR
- Phone:
- 01443 799365
- Email:
- stevejcurry@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window