TRINITY MINISTRIES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1118110
Charity reporting is overdue by 296 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 296 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 296 days
Annual return 05 April 2019 09 October 2020 247 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 09 October 2020 247 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 06 February 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 06 February 2019 1 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 01 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 01 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 31 January 2017 On time Download