TRINITY MINISTRIES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1118110
Charity reporting is overdue by 296 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2015 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019
Total gross income £158.76k £244.29k £128.48k £223.26k £413.99k
Total expenditure £202.09k £134.36k £171.83k £280.55k £310.80k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A