THE ORIENTEERING FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1118793
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 15 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 02 February 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)