ST PETER AND ST PAUL COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH BOURNEMOUTH

Charity number: 1119114
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £78.56k £87.36k £70.54k £73.08k £83.75k
Total expenditure £90.50k £48.55k £45.19k £49.56k £46.96k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A