MUROLE HIGH SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 1118190
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 02 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 22 June 2017 On time