LONDON TAGALOG CENTRAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES

Charity number: 1118219
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 01 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2016 01 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2016 Not Required