LONDON TAGALOG CENTRAL CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES

Charity number: 1118219
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/04/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.66k £3.39k £4.49k £4.11k £4.04k
Total expenditure £5.33k £2.75k £3.98k £4.03k £4.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A