NEW INITIATIVES YOUTH AND COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1121523
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 March 2021 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 January 2020 363 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 January 2020 722 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 21 January 2020 1085 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required