Accounts and annual returns THE QUARRY VILLAGES COMMUNITY TRANSPORT GROUP

Charity number: 1119316
Charity reporting is overdue by 169 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 169 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 169 days
Annual return 01 April 2022 16 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2021 16 January 2023 349 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2020 16 January 2023 714 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2019 18 March 2021 411 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 Not Required