Financial history THE QUARRY VILLAGES COMMUNITY TRANSPORT GROUP

Charity number: 1119316
Charity reporting is overdue by 470 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2015 01/04/2016 01/04/2017 01/04/2018 01/04/2019
Total gross income £16.67k £15.47k £15.28k £12.89k £10.09k
Total expenditure £14.32k £14.43k £13.11k £13.59k £12.62k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k £5.20k £6.00k £5.20k £5.20k