Accounts and annual returns GIRLS SCHOOL AFRICA

Charity number: 1119449
Charity reporting is overdue by 251 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 09 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 251 days
Accounts and TAR 09 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 251 days
Annual return 09 December 2021 09 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 09 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 09 December 2020 21 November 2021 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 09 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 09 December 2019 06 August 2021 301 days late
Accounts and TAR 09 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 09 December 2018 15 May 2020 219 days late
Accounts and TAR 09 December 2018 Not Required