Trustees REDS IN THE COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1118735
Charity reporting is up to date (42 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Matthew Lewis Trustee 08 September 2022
None on record
Gerard Anthony Shields Trustee 29 June 2021
None on record
David Lee Watson Trustee 29 June 2021
None on record
Adewale Adebajo Trustee 24 June 2021
THE PHILADELPHIA NETWORK LIMITED
Received: On time
Edward George Naylor Trustee 17 June 2021
None on record
Craig Oldham Trustee 17 June 2021
None on record
Victoria Ann Beevers Trustee 17 June 2021
None on record
Stuart Rogers Trustee 17 June 2021
None on record
Jean Elizabeth Cryne Trustee 09 November 2019
None on record
Simon Biltcliffe Trustee 24 November 2018
None on record
Sally Elizabeth Hegarty Trustee 28 September 2018
None on record