Accounts and annual returns THE CHARLIE RAMSEY RESEARCH FUND

Charity number: 1119015
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 April 2021 23 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 28 April 2020 20 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 April 2019 18 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 April 2018 12 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 April 2017 25 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2017 Not Required