ASHBOURNE ARTS LIMITED

Charity number: 1120239
Charity reporting is overdue by 85 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £63.55k £52.01k £52.01k £80.18k £60.24k
Total expenditure £57.17k £58.34k £58.34k £87.25k £63.39k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £250 N/A £5.97k