CAMBRIDGE FILM TRUST

Charity number: 1120059
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £350.04k £273.42k £306.80k £225.85k £272.86k
Total expenditure £342.68k £273.39k £285.33k £241.03k £267.41k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A £4.50k