BLUE SKY DEVELOPMENT AND REGENERATION

Charity number: 1118372
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 25 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 25 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 16 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 December 2016 On time Download