BLUE SKY DEVELOPMENT AND REGENERATION

Charity number: 1118372
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.01m £1.95m £1.71m £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.90m £1.84m £1.84m £0 £0
Income from government contracts £10.31k £64.04k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £237.67k £367.70k £334.86k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £1.76m £1.58m £1.37m N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £2.47k £1.56k £565 N/A N/A
Income - Other £8.07k £2.01k £56 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.81m £1.73m £1.77m N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £96.96k £105.87k £69.67k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £5.70k £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A