OPEN MINDS (PHILIPPINES)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support children from impoverished backgrounds who have demonstrated the ability and willingness to succeed academically and the desire to help others benefit from their future success. We provide them full financial support through high school and university and give them counselling to help them attain their goals. We currently support 3 scholars and have over 20 previous graduates.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Philippines
Governance
- 02 July 2007: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF OPEN MINDS (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIMOTHY MARK DANIELS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
LILIA TANTOCO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CATHERINE BALTASAR TANTOCO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEOFF DANIELS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.73k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.73k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 February 2025 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 February 2025 | 383 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 February 2025 | 748 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 February 2025 | 1113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1567 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1567 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21 MAY 2007
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS IN THE PHILIPPINES BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND BURSARIES.
Area of benefit
PHILIPPINES
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 MWROG STREET
RUTHIN
LL15 1LF
- Phone:
- 01824705640
- Email:
- tcaddaniels@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window