Abergavenny Children's Contact Centre

Charity number: 1118461
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required