Abergavenny Children's Contact Centre

Charity number: 1118461
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £12.16k £6.89k £13.53k £2.30k £2.30k
Total expenditure £12.04k £11.16k £5.12k £4.30k £4.30k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.00k N/A £825 N/A N/A