FRIENDS OF WOODLEIGH CHRISTIAN CARE HOME
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RAISING FUNDS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE CARE HOME.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 20 June 2007: Standard registration
- 17 March 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.33k | £1.99k | £2.46k | £3.69k | £4.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.29k | £1.15k | £2.10k | £3.24k | £1.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 03 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 DECEMBER 1999 AMENDED ON 19 FEBRUARY 2002 AS AMENDED 21 APRIL 2007
Charitable objects
ARE THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF THOSE WHO ARE AGED OR SICK OR IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OR IN NEED OF SUPPORT AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE RESIDENT AT WOODLEIGH CHRISTIAN CARE HOME ('' THE HOME'') MANSFIELD ( SUCH RESIDENTS HEREIN CALLED '' THE RESIDENTS'') AND THEIR FRIENDS AND RELATIVES.
Area of benefit
NOTTINGHAMSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window