Shropshire Bookfest

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of children in all forms of literary and creative arts, for the benefit of the public, in particular, but not exclusively by encouraging awareness of and developing interest in all forms of children's literature.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Shropshire
Governance
- 20 July 2007: Standard registration
- SHREWSBURY CHILDREN'S BOOKFEST (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Corinne Davies-Griffith | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
caroline Graham | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Tay | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
sian marshall | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
ELEANOR LOUISE WINTER | Trustee | 11 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
LUCY MORRIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.04k | £34.46k | £34.38k | £52.09k | £55.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.88k | £32.31k | £41.37k | £50.23k | £51.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 MAY 2007 AS AMENDED 4 JUNE 2008 as amended on 07 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN ALL FORMS OF LITERARY AND CREATIVE ARTS, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ENCOURAGING AWARENESS OF AND DEVELOPING INTEREST IN ALL FORMS OF CHILDREN'S LITERATURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE SHREWSBURY AND ATCHAM, SHROPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chaney Plough
Exfords Green
Longden
SHREWSBURY
SY5 8HH
- Phone:
- 07962781270
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window