THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF CRANLEIGH VILLAGE HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping to improve the services provided to people of Cranleigh and surrounding villages by the Village Hospital and Medical Practice
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

18 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 15 August 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Michael Flacks | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|||||
kay Laura bentley | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
simon David bentley | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Peter Byam Hewes | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew Lucas Clark | Trustee | 31 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steve Shutts | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lynda MacDermott | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Mary King | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan George Walton | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael John Bundy | Trustee | 06 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stella Dewar Gravill | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr DIANE CHRISTIE | Trustee | 15 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN HENRY CHEESMAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
ROSEMARY HURTLEY | Trustee |
|
||||||
JULIE ANN FRANCIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DIANNE CHRISTINE GWYNNE DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr JONATHAN HENDLEY VERDON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MALCOLM KEEPING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.08k | £50.81k | £58.45k | £196.48k | £117.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.38k | £98.77k | £51.26k | £98.65k | £98.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 09 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 09 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31 JANUARY 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 26 JULY 2007 as amended on 15 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
4(1) TO FOSTER THE INTEREST OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PATIENTS AND TO SUPPORT THE WORK OF THE HOSPITAL IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY MEANS OF VOLUNTARY SERVICE; 4(2) TO ASSIST PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE HOSPITAL AND OTHER INVALIDS IN THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, OR INFIRM AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE HOSPITAL; 4(3) TO PROVIDE FUNDS FOR THE PURPOSE EITHER OF SUPPLEMENTING IN SUCH MANNER AS THE CHARITY THINKS FIT THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE, OR OF PUTTING SUCH FUNDS OR ANY PART THEREOF AT THE DISPOSAL OF THE COMMITTEE RESPONSIBLE FOR THE MANAGEMENT OF THE HOSPITAL TO BE APPLIED AT THEIR DISCRETION IN SUPPLEMENTING SUCH RESOURCES.
Area of benefit
SURREY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Byfield
Guildford Road
CRANLEIGH
Surrey
GU6 8PA
- Phone:
- 07925975210
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window