Financial history YETEV LEV LONDON JERUSALEM TRUST

Charity number: 1118504
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £828.98k £990.98k £987.16k £984.62k £823.46k
Total expenditure £806.01k £1.22m £1.07m £879.60k £676.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £828.98k £990.98k £987.16k £984.62k £823.46k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £729.83k £1.10m £924.64k £815.62k £589.45k
Expenditure - Raising funds £76.19k £105.62k £117.26k £63.98k £39.68k
Expenditure - Governance £5.25k £0 £0 £7.98k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £724.58k £1.10m £924.64k £807.64k £589.45k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £14.37k £30.40k £0 £46.96k