THE LONDON CHURCHES FUND FOR DESTITUTE ASYLUM SEEKERS

Charity number: 1121108
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 04 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 01 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 14 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 08 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 08 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 30 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 14 October 2016 On time Download