THE LONDON CHURCHES FUND FOR DESTITUTE ASYLUM SEEKERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides small grants to organizations within Greater London that are meeting the welfare needs of destitute asylum-seekers and refugees. Allocation is prioritised to member organizations of the London Churches Refugee Network, non-members may also apply. This ecumenical fund relies on donations from individuals, churches and other charitable foundations to relieve this form of destitu
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
Governance
- 09 October 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Loveitt | Chair | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
BETHAN ANGHARAD LANT | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Matthew Lloyd | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Gillian Angela Dare | Trustee | 26 June 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
STELLA JANET JEFFREY | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
ROBINA ANNE PENELOPE RAFFERTY MBE, BA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
CHRIS BRICE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.39k | £42.44k | £54.82k | £50.75k | £59.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.34k | £37.39k | £46.23k | £53.76k | £54.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23 NOVEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL AND OTHER HARDSHIP AMONGST REFUGEES AND THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM IN THE GREATER LONDON AREA AND THEIR DEPENDENTS; EITHER DIRECTLY OR BY MAKING RESOURCES AVAILABLE TO OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO ACHIEVE THE SAME OBJECT. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL ABOUT THE ISSUES RELATING TO REFUGEES AND THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
112 EMBLETON ROAD
LONDON
SE13 7DG
- Phone:
- 07931408675
- Email:
- Stella.jeffrey47@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window