DUCKLINGS AT ST. MARGARET'S

Charity number: 1121248
Charity reporting is overdue by 449 days
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A