Financial history SOBELL HOUSE HOSPICE CHARITY LIMITED

Charity number: 1118646
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £5.01m £5.01m £4.66m £3.24m £3.29m
Total expenditure £3.64m £3.65m £3.72m £3.87m £3.16m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £496.63k
Income - Donations and legacies £3.35m £2.92m £2.89m £1.58m £1.85m
Income - Other trading activities £1.49m £1.59m £1.54m £1.47m £765.73k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £175.89k £222.38k £232.56k £181.91k £177.78k
Income - Other £0 £277.00k £0 £0 £496.63k
Income - Legacies £1.58m £1.14m £1.04m £568.18k £910.09k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.19m £2.01m £2.14m £2.22m £1.57m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.45m £1.64m £1.58m £1.65m £1.59m
Expenditure - Governance £12.29k £12.77k £13.25k £13.75k £13.71k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.95m £1.73m £1.84m £1.82m £1.06m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £48.45k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0