Accounts and annual returns WHITEGATE CONSERVATION

Charity number: 1118714
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required